Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Arregui Yarza

Archbishop of Guayaquil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1939 BornOñata, Spain
13 Mar 196424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
4 Jan 199050.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
4 Jan 199050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
22 Feb 199050.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzegera
25 Jul 199556.1AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
7 May 200363.9AppointedArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Antonio Arregui Yarza:
Archbishop Antonio Arregui Yarza (born ) Archbishop of Guayaquil

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Guayaquil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,856
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,960
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014