Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Aguilar Miranda

Bishop Emeritus of Ecuador, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1939 Born
29 Jun 196526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
11 Apr 199152.0AppointedBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
4 May 199152.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
14 Feb 200464.8AppointedBishop of Ecuador, Military
18 Jun 201475.2RetiredBishop of Ecuador, Military

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Aguilar Miranda
Bishop Miguel Angel Aguilar Miranda (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ecuador, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Ecuador, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,635
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018