Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raúl Eduardo Cardinal Vela Chiriboga

Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1934 BornRiobamba
28 Jul 195723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Riobamba, Ecuador
20 Apr 197238.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
20 Apr 197238.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausafa
21 May 197238.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausafa
29 Apr 197541.3AppointedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
8 Jul 198955.5AppointedBishop of Ecuador, Military
8 Jul 198955.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
7 Mar 199864.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
21 Mar 200369.2AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
11 Sep 201076.7RetiredArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
20 Nov 201076.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201076.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
28 Nov 201076.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

MicroData Summary for Raúl Eduardo Vela Chiriboga:
Raúl Eduardo Cardinal Vela Chiriboga (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Quito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Jun 2014