Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Polivio Sánchez Loaiza

Bishop of Machala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1946 BornAyapamba
3 Aug 197528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Machala, Ecuador
25 Nov 200458.2AppointedBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
18 Dec 200458.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
22 Dec 200458.3InstalledBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
20 Jul 201366.9AppointedBishop of Machala, Ecuador
14 Sep 201367.0InstalledBishop of Machala, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Ángel Polivio Sánchez Loaiza:
Bishop Ángel Polivio Sánchez Loaiza (born ) Bishop of Machala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Machala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,729
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2013
  • i: CB, 7 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013