Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Ramón Martínez de Ezquerecocha Suso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Babahoyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1935BornJungaitu, Spain
9 Aug 195923.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 198448.8AppointedPrelate of Los Ríos, Ecuador
22 Aug 199458.9AppointedBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
15 Oct 199459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
27 Mar 200872.5ResignedBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
16 Feb 201377.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Babahoyo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Jesús Ramón Martínez de Ezquerecocha Suso:
Bishop Jesús Ramón Martínez de Ezquerecocha Suso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Babahoyo

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,447
  • d: CB, 17 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015