Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Garaygordóbil Berrizbeitia

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Los Ríos, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1915Born
27 Jun 194327.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 196348.1AppointedPrelate of Los Ríos, Ecuador
29 Nov 196348.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
30 Jan 196448.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
5 Jan 197862.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
12 May 198266.5ResignedPrelate of Los Ríos, Ecuador
24 Apr 2018102.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Los Ríos, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Victor Garaygordóbil Berrizbeitia
Bishop Victor Garaygordóbil Berrizbeitia (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Los Ríos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOchandiano, Spain
Death PlaceBegoña, Spain
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Urkiola, Spain

  • a priest for 74.8 years
  • a bishop for 54.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast