Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicanor Carlos Gavinales Chamorro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1890BornSan Gabriel
7 Oct 191525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ibarra, Ecuador
30 May 194756.8AppointedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
21 Sep 194757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
17 Feb 196776.5RetiredBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
17 Feb 196776.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
22 Dec 197080.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
11 Aug 197686.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Nicanor Carlos Gavinales Chamorro:
Bishop Nicanor Carlos Gavinales Chamorro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013