Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Efrem Cardinal Forni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1889Born
6 Jul 191324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
26 Nov 193748.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
27 Nov 193748.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
20 Feb 193849.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Darnis
9 Nov 195364.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
9 Nov 195364.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Luxembourg
24 Oct 195566.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg
19 Mar 196273.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Mar 196273.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
26 Feb 197687.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

MicroData Summary for Efrem Forni
(WikiData: Q1296579)
Efrem Cardinal Forni (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePoliclinico Agostino Gemelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Gallarate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 12
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 67, and Page 114, and Page 115
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 172
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 406, Ascendance
  • loc: AM, 1 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 9 Apr 2023