Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honoré Marie Van Waeyenbergh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Gilba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1891Born
28 Dec 191928.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 195462.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
1 Sep 195462.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gilba
28 Oct 195462.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gilba
19 Jul 197179.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Honoré Marie Van Waeyenbergh
Bishop Honoré Marie Van Waeyenbergh (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast