Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Justinus Marie Ernest Calewaert

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1893Born
23 Apr 192228.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Jan 194854.2AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
8 Mar 194854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Dec 196370.1DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Karel Justinus Marie Ernest Calewaert
Bishop Karel Justinus Marie Ernest Calewaert (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDeinze

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018