Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo-Karel Jozef De Kesel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

Titular Bishop of Synaus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1903BornAdegem
18 Apr 192723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Dec 196057.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Dec 196057.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Synaus
24 Feb 196157.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Synaus
13 Jul 199086.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
3 Aug 200197.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Leo-Karel Jozef De Kesel:
Bishop Leo-Karel Jozef De Kesel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 74.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013