Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Marie van Zuylen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1910BornLiège
11 Sep 193222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
9 Jul 195141.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
9 Jul 195141.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Druas
8 Sep 195141.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druas
7 Dec 196151.9SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Mar 198676.2RetiredBishop of Liège, Belgium
2 Apr 200494.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Marie van Zuylen:
Bishop Guillaume Marie van Zuylen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Liège

  • a priest for 71.6 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013