Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Godfried Cardinal Danneels

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1933Born
17 Aug 195724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
4 Nov 197744.4AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
18 Dec 197744.5Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
19 Dec 197946.5AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
15 Sep 198047.2AppointedBishop of Belgium, Military
2 Feb 198349.6Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198349.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
18 Jan 201076.6RetiredArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
27 Feb 201076.7RetiredBishop of Belgium, Military
14 Mar 201985.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Godfried Danneels (VIAF: 95176718)
Godfried Cardinal Danneels (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKanegem, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}
Ordained PriestBrugge, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}
Ordained BishopSaint-Jacques, Church, Anvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp}
Death PlaceMechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
  • a cardinal for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • d: CB, 14 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1977, Number 151
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast