Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André-Joseph (Mutien) Léonard

Archbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Bishop of Belgium, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1940 BornJambes
19 Jul 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
7 Feb 199150.8AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
14 Apr 199150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
18 Jan 201069.7AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
27 Feb 201069.8InstalledArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
27 Feb 201069.8AppointedBishop of Belgium, Military

MicroData Summary for André-Joseph (Mutien) Léonard:
Archbishop André-Joseph (Mutien) Léonard (born ) Archbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013