Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Delville

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1951 BornLiège
6 Sep 198029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
31 May 201362.1AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
14 Jul 201362.2Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Delville:
Bishop Jean-Pierre Delville (born ) Bishop of Liège

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Liège.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 31 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • c5: CB, 12 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013