Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Warin

Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1948 Born
23 Dec 197224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
8 Jul 200456.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
8 Jul 200456.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tongres
26 Sep 200456.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tongres
5 Jun 201970.9AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
30 Jun 201971.0InstalledBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Pierre Warin
Bishop Pierre Warin (born ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocourt
Ordained BishopSaint-Aubain, Cathedral, Namur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Namur {Namen}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,695
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 Jun 2019

Quantcast