Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lode Van Hecke, O.C.S.O.

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1950 Born
6 Mar 198332.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
20 Aug 199545.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
27 Nov 201969.6AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
23 Feb 202069.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Lode Van Hecke
Bishop Lode Van Hecke O.C.S.O. (born ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoeselare, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}
Ordained BishopSt. Bavo, Cathedral, Gent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Nov 2019
  • c34: CB, 9 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast