Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Josef Cardinal De Kesel

Archbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Bishop of Belgium, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1947 BornGand
26 Aug 197225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
20 Mar 200254.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
20 Mar 200254.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulna
26 May 200254.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulna
25 Jun 201063.0AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
10 Jul 201063.0InstalledBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
6 Nov 201568.3AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
6 Nov 201568.3AppointedBishop of Belgium, Military
12 Dec 201568.4InstalledArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
27 Apr 201668.8InstalledBishop of Belgium, Military
19 Nov 201669.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201669.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

MicroData Summary for Josef De Kesel (VIAF: 173066137)
Josef Cardinal De Kesel (born ) Archbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,192
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2015
  • i: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • i: CB, 27 Apr 2016
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016