Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodewijk Aerts

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1959 Born
7 Jul 198424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
5 Oct 201657.0AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
4 Dec 201657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Lodewijk Aerts (VIAF: 22785142)
Bishop Lodewijk Aerts (born ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeraardsbergen, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}
Ordained BishopSaint Saviour, Cathedral, Brugge, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Oct 2016
  • c3+: CB, 4 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast