Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Luc Hudsyn

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Titular Bishop of Apt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1947 BornUccle
24 Jun 197225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
22 Feb 201164.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
22 Feb 201164.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apt
3 Apr 201164.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apt

MicroData Summary for Jean-Luc Hudsyn:
Bishop Jean-Luc Hudsyn (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,986

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013