Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Lanneau

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Tusuros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1925Born
24 Jul 194924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
14 Feb 198256.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
14 Feb 198256.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tusuros
20 Mar 198256.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tusuros
20 Mar 200276.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
26 Jan 201791.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Paul Lanneau
Bishop Paul Lanneau (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnderlecht
Death PlaceBrussels, Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017