Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan De Bie

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Titular Bishop of Uppenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1937 BornOlen
8 Jul 196124.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 198749.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
13 Mar 198749.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Uppenna
19 Apr 198750.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uppenna
3 Jan 200971.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jan De Bie:
Bishop Jan De Bie (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013