Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Jean Charles Ghislain Houssiau

Bishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1924 Born
6 Feb 194924.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 198661.3AppointedBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
18 May 198661.5Ordained BishopBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
9 May 200176.5RetiredBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Albert Jean Charles Ghislain Houssiau
Bishop Albert Jean Charles Ghislain Houssiau (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHalle

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Liège (Luik, Lüttich).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast