Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Hoogmartens

Bishop of Hasselt, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1952 Born
4 Jul 198230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hasselt, Belgium
8 Jul 199745.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hasselt, Belgium
26 Oct 199745.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hasselt, Belgium
25 Oct 200452.4SucceededBishop of Hasselt, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Patrick Hoogmartens
Bishop Patrick Hoogmartens (born ) Bishop of Hasselt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTongeren

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hasselt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018