Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nyundo

Dioecesis Nyundoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alexis Habiyambere, S.J., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kigali
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Rwanda
  • Square Kilometers: 4,000 (1,545 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 85, Gisenyi, Rwanda
  • Telephone: 540.503
  • Fax: 540.194

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nyundo
14 February 1952ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Ruanda Vicariate Apostolic of Nyundo (erected)
Diocese of Nyundo
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nyundo Diocese of Nyundo
20 December 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of Kabgayi
Diocese of Nyundo
Diocese of Ruhengeri (erected)
5 November 1981Territory LostDiocese of Nyundo Diocese of Cyangugu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nyundo
1970250,667878,08128.5%6520852,9495815623ap1981
1980423,4331,172,00036.1%6818864,9236813226ap1981
1988385,6751,108,51334.8%578655,9333911018ap1991
1999420,0551,108,65437.9%242417,50272819ap2000
2000462,5921,170,54239.5%272717,13343919ap2001
2001453,8851,300,38234.9%404011,34796219ap2002
2002494,8981,334,76737.1%383813,023107019ap2003
2003510,9691,377,34637.1%434311,883137219ap2004
2004516,4831,393,14737.1%4915010,329207119ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 24 Jul 2013