Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Nsengiyumva

Deceased

Archbishop of Kigali, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1936Born
18 Jun 196630.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 197337.8AppointedBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
2 Jun 197438.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
10 Apr 197640.1AppointedArchbishop of Kigali, Rwanda
8 Jun 199458.3DiedArchbishop of Kigali, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Vincent Nsengiyumva
Archbishop Vincent Nsengiyumva (born , died ) Archbishop of Kigali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRwaza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nyundo, Diocese of Nyundo

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast