Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloys Bigirumwami

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nyundo, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1904Born
26 May 192924.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 195247.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyundo, Rwanda
14 Feb 195247.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
1 Jun 195247.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana
10 Nov 195954.8AppointedBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
17 Dec 197368.9ResignedBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
3 Jun 198681.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nyundo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Aloys Bigirumwami
Bishop Aloys Bigirumwami (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nyundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaza

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,952, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast