Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kabgayi

Dioecesis Kabgayensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Smaragde Mbonyintege, Bishop
  • Anastase Mutabazi, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 April 1976
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kigali
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Rwanda
  • Square Kilometers: 2,187 (844 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 66, Gitarama, Rwanda
  • Telephone: 722.716.075

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ruanda
25 April 1922ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Ruanda (erected)
14 February 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ruanda Vicariate Apostolic of Nyundo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kabgayi
14 February 1952Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Ruanda Vicariate Apostolic of Kabgayi
Archdiocese of Kabgayi
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kabgayi Archdiocese of Kabgayi
20 December 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of Kabgayi
Diocese of Nyundo
Diocese of Ruhengeri (erected)
11 September 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Kabgayi Diocese of Astrida (erected)
5 September 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Kabgayi Diocese of Kibungo (erected)
10 April 1976Territory LostArchdiocese of Kabgayi Archdiocese of Kigali (erected)
Diocese of Kabgayi
10 April 1976ElevatedArchdiocese of Kabgayi Diocese of Kabgayi (Metropolitan to Diocese)
5 November 1981Territory LostDiocese of Kabgayi
Diocese of Kibungo
Diocese of Ruhengeri
Diocese of Byumba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ruanda
1949331,1441,356,29124.4%81881691,9597223443ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kabgayi
Archdiocese of Kabgayi
1970320,407721,86044.4%55501053,05114914885ap1971
Diocese of Kabgayi
1980276,181562,00049.1%1917367,671407415ap1981
1990397,341699,46656.8%4916656,1125510217ap1991
1999456,053761,51659.9%465518,9423220421ap2000
2000471,804799,74859.0%834875,4232517821ap2001
2001509,253837,08760.8%824865,9213313021ap2002
2002528,633867,09261.0%917985,3944018621ap2003
2003549,745912,09760.3%619707,8533118822ap2004
2004600,273974,07561.6%6811797,5985321622ap2005
2006596,596969,66861.5%7015857,0185825824ap2007
2011675,0001,051,00064.2%719808,4375121025ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 16 Sep 2012