Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thaddée Ntihinyurwa

Archbishop of Kigali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1942 BornKibeho
11 Jul 197128.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 198139.1AppointedBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda
24 Jan 198239.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cyangugu, Rwanda
9 Mar 199653.4AppointedArchbishop of Kigali, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Thaddée Ntihinyurwa:
Archbishop Thaddée Ntihinyurwa (born ) Archbishop of Kigali

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kigali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 24 Dec 2014