Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Gahamanyi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Butare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920²BornKaduha
15 Aug 195131.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kabgayi, Rwanda
11 Sep 196141.7AppointedBishop of Astrida, Rwanda
6 Jan 196242.0Ordained BishopBishop of Astrida, Rwanda
2 Jan 199777.0RetiredBishop of Butare, Rwanda
19 Jun 199979.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Butare, Rwanda

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Gahamanyi:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Gahamanyi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Butare

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 3
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013