Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Misago

Deceased

Bishop of Gikongoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1943BornRuvune
25 Jul 197128.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 199249.2AppointedBishop of Gikongoro, Rwanda
28 Jun 199249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gikongoro, Rwanda
12 Mar 201269.2DiedBishop of Gikongoro, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Augustin Misago:
Bishop Augustin Misago (died ) Bishop of Gikongoro

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,978
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,051
  • d: CB, 12 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013