Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Butare

Dioecesis Butarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philippe Rukamba, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 12 November 1963
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kigali
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Rwanda
  • Square Kilometers: 1,958 (756 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 69, Butare, Rwanda
  • Telephone: 252.530.129
  • Fax: 252.530.652

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Astrida
11 September 1961ErectedArchdiocese of Kabgayi Diocese of Astrida (erected)
Diocese of Butare
12 November 1963Name ChangedDiocese of Astrida Diocese of Butare
30 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Butare Diocese of Gikongoro (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Butare
1969356,418857,00041.6%48571053,39413727322ap1971
1980497,6961,092,00045.6%62541164,29012526122ap1981
1990675,5061,374,44549.1%71421135,97714735424ap1991
1999402,024631,66963.6%45561013,9809635220ap2000
2000399,747640,60962.4%5719765,2599435920ap2001
2001422,697673,44662.8%85191044,0646336320ap2002
2002441,308715,97961.6%82221044,2437735220ap2003
2003466,401747,65962.4%85231084,3187638620ap2004
2004477,100825,03257.8%88221104,3378339521ap2005
2006474,045848,85755.8%104211253,79229540823ap2007
2012538,000985,00054.6%93291224,40912147925ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 26 Nov 2014