Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Rukamba

Bishop of Butare, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1948 Born
25 Jul 197426.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 199748.6AppointedBishop of Butare, Rwanda
12 Apr 199748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Butare, Rwanda
28 May 201264.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gikongoro, Rwanda
26 Nov 201466.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Gikongoro, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Philippe Rukamba
Bishop Philippe Rukamba (born ) Bishop of Butare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKabarondo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Butare.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,947
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast