Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kibungo

Dioecesis Kibungensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 September 1968
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kigali
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Rwanda
  • Square Kilometers: 2,670 (1,031 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesekibungo.com/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 30, Kibungo, Rwanda
  • Telephone: 789.589.308

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
5 September 1968ErectedArchdiocese of Kabgayi (Eastern part) Diocese of Kibungo (erected)
10 April 1976Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Kibungo (from Kabgayi)
5 November 1981Territory LostDiocese of Kabgayi
Diocese of Kibungo
Diocese of Ruhengeri (Eastern part)
Diocese of Byumba (erected) (Ruhengeri and Byumba)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1969131,731317,65041.5%174216,27222547ap1971
1980166,846400,00041.7%2113344,907314911ap1981
1990223,315495,09045.1%276336,767235711ap1991
1999334,142839,96839.8%419506,68299011ap2000
2000345,935858,39740.3%427497,059279911ap2002
2002367,406933,26639.4%363610,2052510012ap2003
2003376,503934,64340.3%38389,907259312ap2004
2004398,700935,80942.6%393910,22369312ap2005
2006412,148937,10644.0%353511,77569512ap2007
2013402,3591,056,97638.1%61616,596513313ap2014
2016363,5931,117,40832.5%61615,960512215ap2017
2019364,8301,032,14735.3%66665,5273114620ap2020
2021362,7001,041,43034.8%69695,2562416720ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 75, and Page 76
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 393, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.8, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 19 Jul 2024