Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Servilien Nzakamwita

Bishop of Byumba, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1943 Born
11 Jul 197128.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kibungo, Rwanda
13 Mar 199652.8AppointedBishop of Byumba, Rwanda
2 Jun 199653.1Ordained BishopBishop of Byumba, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Servilien Nzakamwita
Bishop Servilien Nzakamwita (born ) Bishop of Byumba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRushaki

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Byumba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,757

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018