Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Kambanda

Archbishop of Kigali, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1958 Born
8 Sep 199031.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kigali, Rwanda
7 May 201354.4AppointedBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
20 Jul 201354.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
19 Nov 201860.0AppointedArchbishop of Kigali, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Antoine Kambanda (VIAF: 86284567)
Archbishop Antoine Kambanda (born ) Archbishop of Kigali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyamata
Ordained BishopOpen Air near, Saint-André, Cathedral, Kibungo, Diocese of Kibungo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kigali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 9 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,839
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast