Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulo de Tarso Campos

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo

Titular Archbishop of Garba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1895BornJaú
15 Aug 192024.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 193539.7AppointedBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Jul 193539.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Dec 194146.3AppointedBishop of Campinas, Brazil
19 Apr 195862.6AppointedArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Sep 196873.0ResignedArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Sep 196873.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Garba
2 Mar 197074.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo de Tarso Campos:
Archbishop Paulo de Tarso Campos (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015