Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel da Silveira d’Elboux

Deceased

Archbishop of Curitiba, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1904BornItu
15 Aug 193127.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
10 Jan 194035.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
10 Jan 194035.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
31 Mar 194036.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
22 Feb 194641.9AppointedBishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
19 Aug 195046.4AppointedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
8 Dec 195046.7InstalledArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
6 Feb 197065.9DiedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel da Silveira d’Elboux:
Archbishop Manuel da Silveira d’Elboux (born , died ) Archbishop of Curitiba

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015