Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaime Luiz Coelho

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Maringá, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1916Born
7 Dec 194125.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 195640.3AppointedBishop of Maringá, Brazil
20 Jan 195740.4Ordained BishopBishop of Maringá, Brazil
24 Mar 195740.6InstalledBishop of Maringá, Brazil
16 Oct 197963.2AppointedArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
20 Jan 198063.4InstalledArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
7 May 199780.7RetiredArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
5 Aug 201397.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Maringá, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime Luiz Coelho
Archbishop Jaime Luiz Coelho (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maringá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranca

  • a priest for 71.6 years
  • a bishop for 56.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 5 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017