Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Eugênio Pérez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1928Born
8 Dec 195426.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 197041.8AppointedBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jun 197042.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jun 198153.0AppointedBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jun 200375.1RetiredBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Nov 201284.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Eugênio Pérez
Bishop Luiz Eugênio Pérez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaboticabal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrlandia
Ordained BishopSão José, Church, Cravinhos

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,876
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast