Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milton Kenan Júnior

Bishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1963 BornTaiúva
5 Sep 198723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Oct 200945.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Oct 200945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
27 Dec 200946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
5 Nov 201450.9AppointedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Dec 201451.1InstalledBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Milton Kenan Júnior:
Bishop Milton Kenan Júnior (born ) Bishop of Barretos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barretos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2009
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,333
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 12 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014