Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jaboticabal

Dioecesis Iaboticaballensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 25 January 1929
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ribeirão Preto
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 5,175 (1,998 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 1
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesejaboticabal.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Jose Bonifacio 432, Bairro Aparecida, 14882-035 Jaboticabal; C.P. 48, 14870-970 Jaboticabal, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (016)3202-0390

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
25 January 1929ErectedDiocese of São Carlos do Pinhal (Jaboticabal, Barretos, Bebedouro, Pitangueiras, Viradouro, Monte Alto, Monte Azul, Tayassù, Tayuva, Olympia, Collina, Cajoby, Irupy, Piranjy, Guaracy, and Severino) Diocese of Jaboticabal (erected)
14 February 1958Territory AddedDiocese of São Carlos (St. Matthaei (in Guarida)) Diocese of Jaboticabal
14 February 1958Territory AddedDiocese of Ribeirão Preto (Barrinha, Pradópolis, and Martinho Prado (in Guarida)) Diocese of Jaboticabal
14 February 1958Territory AddedDiocese of Rio Preto (Fernando Prestes) Diocese of Jaboticabal
19 April 1958Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Jaboticabal (from São Paulo)
10 October 1969Territory LostDiocese of Jaboticabal (Riolândia, Paulo de Faria, Orindiuva, Icém, and Altair) Diocese of Rio Preto
10 October 1969Territory AddedTerritorial Prelature of Carolina (Gandido Rodrigues, Taquaritinga, Santa Ernestina, and Dobrada)
Diocese of Rio Preto (Palmares, Ariranha, and Santa Adélia)
Diocese of Jaboticabal
7 July 1971Territory AddedArchdiocese of Ribeirão Preto (Morro Agudo, Ipua, Guaira, and Miguelópolis) Diocese of Jaboticabal
14 April 1973Territory LostDiocese of Jaboticabal (Olimpia, Guaira, Miguelópolis, Morro Agudo, Colina, Ipua, Severínia, Cajobí, Guarací, Jaborandí, and Colombia) Diocese of Barretos (erected)
9 February 2000Territory LostDiocese of Jaboticabal (Ariranha, Palmares Paulista, Paraíso, and Santa Adélia)
Diocese of Rio Preto (Catanduva, Catiguá, Elisário, Ibirá, Nováis, Pindorama, Tabapuá, and Urêpes)
Diocese of São Carlos (Irapua, Itajobi, Marapoama, Novo Horizonte, and Sales)
Diocese of Catanduva (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950250,000285,00087.7%918279,259718224ap1951
1966300,000350,00085.7%2715427,1421720030ap1967
1970418,377.0%291645024834ap1971
1976250,000295,00084.7%2012327,81211312627ap1977
1980249,000291,00085.6%219308,3002912728ap1981
1990311,000356,00087.4%326388,1843610129ap1991
1999450,000500,00090.0%3911509,0001136939ap2000
2000404,000449,00090.0%3910498,2441127240ap2001
2001400,000435,00092.0%458537,5471107436ap2002
2002400,000435,00092.0%457527,692198638ap2003
2003400,000435,00092.0%459547,4071117538ap2004
2004320,000435,85473.4%418496,5301117639ap2005
2006327,000446,00073.3%517585,637107439ap2007
2013366,000486,00075.3%5610665,5451117742ap2014
2016375,000498,00075.3%584626,0481656742ap2017
2019384,000510,00075.3%573606,4001736243ap2020
2021381,000505,80075.3%582606,3502826243ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 359, to Page 362
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 536, to Page 539
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 90, to Page 94
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 71, and Page 72
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 63, Page 843, and Page 844

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 27 Feb 2024