Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sérgio Cardinal da Rocha

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1959 Born
14 Dec 198425.1Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
13 Jun 200141.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
13 Jun 200141.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba
11 Aug 200141.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba
31 Jan 200747.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
3 Sep 200848.8SucceededArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
15 Jun 201151.6AppointedArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
6 Aug 201151.7InstalledArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
19 Nov 201657.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201657.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia
23 Apr 201757.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia
11 Mar 202060.3AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
5 Jun 202060.6InstalledArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sérgio da Rocha
Sérgio Cardinal da Rocha (born ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDobrada
Ordained BishopSão Carlos Borromeu, Cathedral, São Carlos, Diocese of São Carlos, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2007
  • c1: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,014
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast