Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antônio Aparecido Tosi Marques

Archbishop Emeritus of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1948 Born
2 Dec 197325.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 Dec 197426.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Jul 199143.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
10 Jul 199143.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
20 Sep 199143.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysinia
10 Oct 199143.4InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Jan 199950.6AppointedArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
24 Mar 199950.8InstalledArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
11 Oct 202375.4RetiredArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Antônio Aparecido Tosi Marques
(WikiData: Q556550)
Archbishop José Antônio Aparecido Tosi Marques (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fortaleza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaú, Diocese of São Carlos do Pinhal
Ordained DeaconSão Carlos Borromeu, Cathedral, São Carlos, Diocese of São Carlos, Sao Paulo
Ordained PriestSanto Antonio, Church, São José em Barra Bonita, Diocese of São Carlos, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopSão Carlos Borromeu, Cathedral, São Carlos, Diocese of São Carlos, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Fortaleza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,646
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 19 Dec 2023