Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luiz Gomes de Vasconcelos

Bishop of Sobral, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1963 BornGaranhuns
19 Aug 198926.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
9 Dec 198926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
21 Mar 201248.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
21 Mar 201248.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Canapium
11 Jun 201249.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canapium
1 Feb 201551.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
8 Jul 201552.1AppointedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Luiz Gomes de Vasconcelos:
Bishop José Luiz Gomes de Vasconcelos (born ) Bishop of Sobral

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sobral.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2012
  • od/ob/c1+: CB, 21 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,444
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 9 Jul 2015