Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando José Monteiro Guimarães, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Brazil, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1946 BornRecife
25 Jan 196518.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Dec 196923.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Aug 197125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Mar 200861.6AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
31 Mar 200861.7Ordained BishopBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
6 Aug 201468.0AppointedArchbishop of Brazil, Military

MicroData Summary for Fernando José Monteiro Guimarães:
Archbishop Fernando José Monteiro Guimarães C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Brazil, Military

Please contact the Archbishop through the Military Ordinariate of Brazil, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,701
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Aug 2014