Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cláudio Aury Affonso Cardinal Hummes, O.F.M.

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1934 BornMontenegro
3 Aug 195823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Mar 197540.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Mar 197540.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
25 May 197540.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
29 Dec 197541.3SucceededBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 May 199661.8AppointedArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
15 Apr 199863.6AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
21 Feb 200166.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200166.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana
31 Oct 200672.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
7 Oct 201076.1RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy

MicroData Summary for Cláudio Aury Affonso Hummes:
Cláudio Aury Affonso Cardinal Hummes O.F.M. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Clergy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015