Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Airton José dos Santos

Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1956 Born
8 Dec 198529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Dec 200145.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Dec 200145.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
2 Mar 200245.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes
4 Aug 200448.1AppointedBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Sep 200448.2InstalledBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Feb 201255.6AppointedArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Apr 201255.8InstalledArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Dec 201559.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 Aug 201660.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Apr 201861.8AppointedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Airton José dos Santos
Archbishop Airton José dos Santos (born ) Archbishop of Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Repouso
Ordained BishopGinásio Poliesportivo, São Bernardo do Campo, Diocese of Santo André, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mariana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2012
  • i: CB, 8 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,141
  • ab: CB, 16 Dec 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast