Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moacir Aparecido de Freitas

Bishop of Votuporanga, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1962 BornIbirá
24 Oct 198725.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Dec 198725.3Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Jul 201653.9AppointedBishop of Votuporanga, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Oct 201654.1Ordained BishopBishop of Votuporanga, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Oct 201654.1InstalledBishop of Votuporanga, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Moacir Aparecido de Freitas
Bishop Moacir Aparecido de Freitas (born ) Bishop of Votuporanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Votuporanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2016
  • od/c01/i: CB, 21 Jul 2016
  • ob: CB, 22 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Oct 2016