Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orani João Cardinal Tempesta, O. Cist.

Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre della Providenza a Monte Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1950 BornSão José do Rio Pardo
2 Feb 196918.6ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
7 Dec 197424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
26 Feb 199746.7AppointedBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Apr 199746.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Mar 199948.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Dec 200252.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
13 Oct 200454.3AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
8 Dec 200454.5InstalledArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
27 Feb 200958.7AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Apr 200958.8InstalledArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Feb 201463.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201463.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre della Providenza a Monte Verde
12 Apr 201463.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre della Providenza a Monte Verde

MicroData Summary for Orani João Tempesta:
Orani João Cardinal Tempesta O. Cist. (born ) Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,953
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014